WA HB1468 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning bilingual educators.
Title
Concerning bilingual educators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5070 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.