WA HB1473 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a right of first repurchase for surplus transportation property.
Title
Providing a right of first repurchase for surplus transportation property.
Sponsors
Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] |
Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] | Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-27 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1473&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1473.pdf |