WA HB1487 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the validity of temporary elevator licenses, expanding membership of the elevator safety advisory committee, allowing homeowners to remove certain conveyances from their residences, and eliminating duplicate paperwork.
Title
Extending the validity of temporary elevator licenses, expanding membership of the elevator safety advisory committee, allowing homeowners to remove certain conveyances from their residences, and eliminating duplicate paperwork.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-01-29 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5471 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-26 - Effective date 7/28/2019.