WA HB1489 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a program for the consolidation of traffic-based financial obligations to facilitate reinstatement of driving privileges that are suspended because of failure to pay.
Title
Creating a program for the consolidation of traffic-based financial obligations to facilitate reinstatement of driving privileges that are suspended because of failure to pay.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] |
Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-20 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5575 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.