WA HB1490 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the application of the occupational disease presumption for cancer for Hanford site workers.
Title
Amending the application of the occupational disease presumption for cancer for Hanford site workers.
Sponsors
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-23 | House | Chapter 108, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-17 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2019-02-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-02-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-01-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-01-31 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5507 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.