WA HB1494 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Aligning statutory redistricting deadlines to the Constitution.
Title
Aligning statutory redistricting deadlines to the Constitution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-19 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5502 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1494&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1494.pdf |