WA HB1495 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the joint legislative task force on criminal sentencing.
Title
Establishing the joint legislative task force on criminal sentencing.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-07 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |