WA HB1507 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting physical safety and security of school buildings, grounds, and surroundings through environmental design principles.
Title
Promoting physical safety and security of school buildings, grounds, and surroundings through environmental design principles.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Walsh [R] | Rep. Vicki Kraft [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-26 | House | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |