WA HB1514 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing wage liens.
Title
Establishing wage liens.
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Sen. Drew Hansen [D] | Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] |
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-18 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |