WA HB1520 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning calendar election dates on ballot envelopes.
Title
Concerning calendar election dates on ballot envelopes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | House | Chapter 12, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:30 AM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2019-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-08 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |