WA HB1521 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for accountability and transparency in government contracting.
Title
Providing for accountability and transparency in government contracting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-04-02 | House | Chapter 269, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 67; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2020-02-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 65; nays, 32; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-05 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-05 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2020-01-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-05 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5655 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.