WA HB1564 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the nursing facility medicaid payment system.
Title
Concerning the nursing facility medicaid payment system.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Joe Schmick [R] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-08 | House | Chapter 301, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2019-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-18 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5569 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.