WA HB1565 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning certain providers sharing background checks.
Title
Concerning certain providers sharing background checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Placed on third reading. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2019-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-04 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-04 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-13 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5568 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.