WA HB1567 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the sale and installation of solid fuel burning devices.
Title
Concerning the sale and installation of solid fuel burning devices.
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-28 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 9:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5697 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.