WA HB1574 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing eligibility for child care and early learning programs for homeless and other vulnerable children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing eligibility for child care and early learning programs for homeless and other vulnerable children.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-05HouseHSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-05HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-24HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.

Same As/Similar To

SB5820 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback