WA HB1584 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Effective date 8/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Effective date 8/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Restricting the availability of state funds to regional transportation planning organizations that do not provide a reasonable opportunity for voting membership to certain federally recognized tribes.
Title
Restricting the availability of state funds to regional transportation planning organizations that do not provide a reasonable opportunity for voting membership to certain federally recognized tribes.
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] |
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Bill Ramos [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Effective date 8/1/2019. |
2019-04-24 | House | Chapter 118, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-07 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-07 | House | 1st substitute bill not substituted. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2019-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5778 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.