WA HB1590 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the local sales and use tax for affordable housing to be imposed by a councilmanic authority.
Title
Allowing the local sales and use tax for affordable housing to be imposed by a councilmanic authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-31 | House | Chapter 222, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 52; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 46; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2019-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | HOUS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 9:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |