WA HB1591 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the rights of persons experiencing homelessness.
Title
Concerning the rights of persons experiencing homelessness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |