WA HB1595 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the sharing of information between participants in multidisciplinary coordination of child sexual abuse investigations.
Title
Concerning the sharing of information between participants in multidisciplinary coordination of child sexual abuse investigations.
Sponsors
Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2019-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-04 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-19 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5461 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.