WA HB1608 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting patient care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting patient care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-03-25HouseChapter 102, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-25HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-09HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-07SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2020-03-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-25SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-24SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-24SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-21SenatePublic hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-20SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2020-02-17HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 65; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-17HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-17HouseFloor amendment
2020-02-17House1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-16HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-01-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2019-03-07HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-22HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-22HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-22HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-20HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-12HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-25HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Same As/Similar To

SB5542 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1608&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1608.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1608-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1608-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1608-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1608-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118508&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-17-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1608&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118508&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1608&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback