WA HB1623 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sign language interpreting in public schools.
Title
Concerning sign language interpreting in public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-19 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1623&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1623.pdf |