WA HB1641 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning programs for highly capable students.
Title
Concerning programs for highly capable students.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Mike Steele [R] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] |
Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-18 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5354 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.