WA HB1644 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a youth development work group within the department of children, youth, and families.
Title
Concerning the creation of a youth development work group within the department of children, youth, and families.
Sponsors
Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] |
Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2019-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-04 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-15 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-15 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5665 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.