WA HB1645 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 1/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 1/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning certificates of parental improvement.
Title
Concerning certificates of parental improvement.
Sponsors
Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] |
Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | House | Effective date 1/1/2021. |
2020-04-02 | House | Chapter 270, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2020-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services & Early Learning. |
2020-02-11 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | HSEL - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
2020-01-13 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-15 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5533 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.