WA HB1648 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for suicide awareness and prevention programs to create safer homes and reduce suicide among service members, veterans, and their families.
Title
Providing for suicide awareness and prevention programs to create safer homes and reduce suicide among service members, veterans, and their families.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-20 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |