WA HB1651 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the rights of clients of the developmental disabilities administration of the department of social and health services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the rights of clients of the developmental disabilities administration of the department of social and health services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-02HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-04-02HouseChapter 271, 2020 Laws.
2020-04-02HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-09HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-07SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2020-02-28SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-28SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-28SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2020-02-17HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-17HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-17House2nd substitute bill substituted
2020-02-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-01-31HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-01-28HouseHSEL - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-24HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-13HouseReferred to Human Services & Early Learning.
2020-01-13HouseCommittee relieved of further consideration.
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-15HouseHSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-13HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-08HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-25HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.

Same As/Similar To

SB5843 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1651&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1651.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1651-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1651-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1651-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1651-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118599&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-17-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1651&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118599&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1651&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback