WA HB1653 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum tax rate for the voter-approved local sales and use tax for emergency communication systems and facilities.
Title
Increasing the maximum tax rate for the voter-approved local sales and use tax for emergency communication systems and facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] |
Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-25 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5272 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1653&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1653.pdf |