WA HB1660 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the participation of students who are low income in extracurricular activities.
Title
Concerning the participation of students who are low income in extracurricular activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | House | Chapter 13, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 3rd substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | ED - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-03-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 62; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-12 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |