WA HB1668 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Washington health corps to support health care professionals who provide service in underserved communities.
Title
Creating the Washington health corps to support health care professionals who provide service in underserved communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-08 | House | Chapter 302, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 93; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-20 | House | CWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-08 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:30 AM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |