WA HB1674 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the term alternative learning experience to personalized learning experience.
Title
Changing the term alternative learning experience to personalized learning experience.
Sponsors
Rep. Skyler Rude [R] | Rep. Mike Steele [R] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-15 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-07 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |