WA HB1680 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning local government infrastructure funding.
Title
Concerning local government infrastructure funding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-26 | House | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2019-02-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5952 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.