WA HB1688 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning resident student status as applied to veterans.
Title
Concerning resident student status as applied to veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] | Rep. Robert Sutherland [R] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Sen. Chris Gildon [R] |
Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-24 | House | Chapter 126, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2019-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-08 | House | CWD - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:30 AM. |
2019-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5713 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.