WA HB1694 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing tenants to pay certain sums in installments.
Title
Allowing tenants to pay certain sums in installments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-27 | House | Chapter 169, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 53; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | FIET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |
2020-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-01-21 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-15 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-15 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-15 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |