WA HB1707 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying qualifications for disabled veterans to receive fee exempt license plates.
Title
Modifying qualifications for disabled veterans to receive fee exempt license plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | Senate | Returned to Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-03-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-27 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |