WA HB1713 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Improving law enforcement response to missing and murdered Native American women.
Title
Improving law enforcement response to missing and murdered Native American women.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-24 | House | Chapter 127, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 8. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-19 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |