WA HB1726 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning services provided by health care professional students.
Title
Concerning services provided by health care professional students.
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Joe Schmick [R] | Sen. June Robinson [D] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] |
Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-07 | House | Chapter 270, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2019-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-20 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |