WA HB1727 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning gift cards.
Title
Concerning gift cards.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Effective date 7/1/2020. |
2019-05-13 | House | Chapter 376, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | FIET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |
2019-03-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-12 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |