WA HB1728 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Labor & Workplace Standards Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Labor & Workplace Standards Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Preventing the sexual harassment and sexual assault of certain isolated workers.
Title
Preventing the sexual harassment and sexual assault of certain isolated workers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-14 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5258 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1728&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1728.pdf |