WA HB1748 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the hospital safety net assessment.
Title
Concerning the hospital safety net assessment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-25 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5734 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/1/2019.