WA HB1752 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing contractor bonding requirements.
Title
Increasing contractor bonding requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-14 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-14 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5795 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-26 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1752&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1752.pdf |