WA HB1768 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning substance use disorder professional practice.
Title
Concerning substance use disorder professional practice.
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019*. |
2019-05-21 | House | Chapter 444, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-28 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-28 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate receded from amendments. |
2019-04-26 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | BH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-05 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-22 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |