WA HB1772 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning motorized foot scooters.
Title
Concerning motorized foot scooters.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Kelly Chambers [R] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] |
Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-29 | House | Chapter 170, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 80; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 7. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-03-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5751 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.