WA HB1773 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the practice of midwifery.
Title
Concerning the practice of midwifery.
Sponsors
Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Tami Green [D] |
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Rep. Jessyn Farrell [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-04-02 | House | Chapter 187, 2014 Laws. |
2014-04-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-17 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-27 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-23 | House | HCW - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-23 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2014-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 5:30 PM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2013-03-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-11 | House | Floor amendment |
2013-03-11 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-22 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-22 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-08 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5626 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.