WA HB1783 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creating the Washington state office of equity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the Washington state office of equity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseEffective date 6/11/2020*.
2020-04-03HouseChapter 332, 2020 Laws PV.
2020-04-03HouseGovernor partially vetoed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-11SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-09HousePassed final passage; yeas, 57; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-05SenateFloor amendment
2020-03-05SenateCommittee amendment not adopted.
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-02SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-03-02SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-26SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-26SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-26SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-26SenateSGTE - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-13SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-23SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
2020-01-20HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-01-20HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-01-20HouseFloor amendment
2020-01-20House2nd substitute bill substituted
2020-01-14HousePlaced on second reading.
2020-01-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2019-03-04HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-28HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-13HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-13HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-13HouseSGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-13HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-30HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.

Same As/Similar To

SB5776 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1783&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1783.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1783-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1783-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1783-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1783-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1783-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118867&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=01-20-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1783&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118867&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1783&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118867&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-09-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1783&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback