WA HB1785 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Environment & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Environment & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the volatility of crude oil received in the state by rail.
Title
Concerning the volatility of crude oil received in the state by rail.
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Sen. June Robinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5579 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1785&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1785.pdf |