WA HB1791 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning trafficking.
Title
Concerning trafficking.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Parker [R] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Susan Fagan [R] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-04-02 | House | Chapter 188, 2014 Laws. |
2014-04-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-10 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2014-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-04 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-04 | House | PS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-08 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |