WA HB1793 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing additional uses for automated traffic safety cameras for traffic congestion reduction and increased safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing additional uses for automated traffic safety cameras for traffic congestion reduction and increased safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-31HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-03-31HouseChapter 224, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-31HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-11SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-09HousePassed final passage; yeas, 56; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-07SenateCommittee amendment
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-02SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-03-02SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2020-02-03SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2020-01-30SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-01-28SenatePlaced on third reading by Rules Committee.
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-04-28SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-04-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-24SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-24SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass.
2019-04-24SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 8:00 AM.
2019-04-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2019-04-15HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-15HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-15HouseFloor amendment
2019-04-15HouseAmendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill.
2019-04-15House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-04-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2019-03-06HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-27HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-27HouseTR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-31HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

SB5789 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1793&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1793.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1793-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1793-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1793-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1793-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118920&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-15-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1793&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118920&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=01-30-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1793&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118920&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-07-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1793&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118920&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-09-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1793&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback