WA HB1797 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to Local Government.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to Local Government.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning local governments planning and zoning for accessory dwelling units.
Title
Concerning local governments planning and zoning for accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Local Government. |
2020-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5812 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.