WA HB1798 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning short-term rentals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning short-term rentals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HouseEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-09HouseChapter 346, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-09HouseGovernor signed.
2019-04-26HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-18HousePassed final passage; yeas, 70; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2019-04-11SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-04-11SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-11SenateCommittee amendment
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-29SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-28SenateFIET - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-09SenateFirst reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade.
2019-03-07HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 65; nays, 32; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-07HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-07House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-06HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-20HouseCPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-20HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-19HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-12HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-31HouseFirst reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business.

Same As/Similar To

SB5870 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-14 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1798&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1798.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1798-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1798-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1798-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118930&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-07-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1798&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118930&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-11-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1798&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118930&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-18-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1798&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback