WA HB1808 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to House Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to House Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Making the nonprofit and library fund-raising exemption permanent.
Title
Making the nonprofit and library fund-raising exemption permanent.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to House Rules 3. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-21 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |